Kelley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03044
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER/JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Donna M. Kelley against Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2007. (tg)
October 9, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 8, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Donna M. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Counsel# 3 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA# 4 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 8, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Donna M. Kelley. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 1, 2007 10 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. cc: ALJ and OH&A w/copy of MO(tg)
August 1, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. (tg)
January 26, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY-MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
November 27, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/27/2006. (cla)
November 27, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
November 27, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/26/2007. (rw)
November 21, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 6, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 6, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
July 13, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
July 13, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Donna M. Kelley and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 10, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on July 11, 2006. (tg)
July 13, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Donna M. Kelley. (tg)
July 13, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Donna M. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Letter from SSA)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?