Hubbard v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03062
Filed: October 12, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER/JUDGMENT affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 14, 2007. (tg)
November 14, 2007 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 14, 2007. (tg)
April 30, 2007 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 27, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Marna J. Hubbard. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 13, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File and allowing until 3/27/07 for plaintiff to file appeal brief. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/13/07. (ct)
March 12, 2007 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Marna J. Hubbard. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 8, 2007 9 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/8/07. (ct)
February 8, 2007 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.. (ct)
February 8, 2007 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 02/08/2007. (caz)
February 8, 2007 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (caz)
February 8, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/12/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/9/2007. (mfr)
February 7, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
December 28, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on December 28, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
October 12, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
October 12, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Marna J. Hubbard and 2 Application filed by Marna J. Hubbard, allowing the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis and directs the clerk to file the complaint without payment of filing fee. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/10/06. (ct)
October 12, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Marna J. Hubbard. (ct)
October 12, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Marna J. Hubbard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?