Mellang v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Constance Mellang
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03002
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2008 13 JUDGMENT granting 9 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommendations re 12 Report and Recommendations; JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Constance Mellang against Social Security Administration Commissioner; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 21, 2008. (ct)
May 2, 2008 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Constance Mellang. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 2, 2008. (cnn)
April 28, 2008 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 14, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
April 14, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Constance Mellang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit of Counsel, # 3 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA, # 4 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 14, 2008 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Constance Mellang. (Spencer, Frederick)
January 17, 2008 8 JUDGMENT reversing decision of Commissioner, REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY AND adopting 7 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 17, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
December 21, 2007 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Constance Mellang. Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 21, 2007. (ct)
June 28, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 13, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Constance Mellang. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 05/16/2007. (caz)
May 15, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/14/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/16/2007. (mfr)
May 15, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 3, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
January 3, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Constance Mellang, and directing that 1 Complaint, filed by Constance Mellang, be entered nunc pro tunc as of 12/4/06. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/28/06. (ct)
January 3, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Constance Mellang. (ct)
January 3, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Constance Mellang. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 12/4/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellang v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Mellang
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?