Bruyere v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Terilee G. Bruyere
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03012
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2008 11 JUDGMENT affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 15, 2008. (jn)
February 15, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 15, 2008. (jn)
October 18, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 21, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Terilee G. Bruyere. (Spencer, Frederick)
September 11, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File brief and allowing until 9/21/07 to file the brief. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 9/10/07. (ct)
September 10, 2007 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief by Terilee G. Bruyere. (Spencer, Frederick)
September 7, 2007 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 7, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit government's consent)(djm)
August 13, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 09/10/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 08/13/2007. (caz)
August 9, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/10/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/8/2007. (mfr)
August 9, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
April 6, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
April 6, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Terilee G. Bruyere, and directing clerk to file the complaint ifp and nunc pro tunc as of 3/29/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/30/07. (ct)
April 6, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Terilee G. Bruyere. (ct)
April 6, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Terilee G. Bruyere. Filed nunc pro tunc as of March 29, 2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruyere v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terilee G. Bruyere
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?