Young v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Lenora Young
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03016
Filed: May 9, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER re 9 Memorandum Opinion; affirming decision of Commissioner and dismiss case w/prejudice.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2008. cc w/Memorandum Opinion to ALJ & OH&A(ct)
February 26, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2008. (ct)
September 6, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 7, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Lenora Young. (Bartels, Anthony)
July 16, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 07/16/2007. (caz)
July 13, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/13/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/11/2007. (rw)
July 13, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 11, 2007 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lenora Young. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 5/14/2007, answer due 7/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bartels, Anthony)
June 1, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 1, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
May 9, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (jn)
May 9, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 5/1/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 3, 2007. (jn)
May 9, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lenora Young. (jn)
May 9, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Lenora Young. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/1/07.(jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Young
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?