White v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Leslie Gene White
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03023
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2008 8 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 affirming decision of the Administrative Law Judge and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 2, 2008. (ct)
May 29, 2008 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Leslie Gene White. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 29, 2008. (tg)
January 9, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 10, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Leslie Gene White. (Spencer, Frederick)
November 13, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 12/10/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 11/13/2007. (cla)
November 8, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/10/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/7/2008. (mfr)
November 8, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 1, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting re 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Leslie Gene White and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of May 29, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 30, 2007. (tg)
June 1, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Leslie Gene White. (tg)
June 1, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
June 1, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Leslie Gene White to be filed nunc pro tunc as of May 29, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg) Modified on 6/1/2007 to add text(tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Gene White
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?