Huff v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Teresa C Huff
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03029
Filed: June 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff is entitled to compensation under the EAJA in the amount of $2,222.34 on Attorney Fees and this amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future; further parties are reminded that the award herein under EAJA will be taken account at such time as a reasonable fee is determined pursuant to 42 USC 406 in order to prevent double recovery by counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 15, 2008. (rw)
November 19, 2008 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by Teresa C Huff. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 19, 2008. (tg)
November 17, 2008 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 3, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rw)
November 3, 2008 14 AFFIDAVIT filed by Teresa C Huff Plaintiff's Attorney's Affidavit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney's Itemization of Time)(Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 13 AFFIDAVIT filed by Teresa C Huff Plaintiff's Affidavit. (Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of EAJA Attorney Fees by Teresa C Huff. (Bishop, Donald)
November 3, 2008 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA by Teresa C Huff. (Bishop, Donald)
August 7, 2008 10 JUDGMENT granting defendant's motion to remand, reversing decision of Commissioner and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 7, 2008. (ct)
July 17, 2008 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Teresa C Huff. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2008. (jn)
November 8, 2007 8 REPLY by Teresa C Huff re 7 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Government). (Bishop, Donald)
November 6, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 9, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Teresa C Huff. (Bishop, Donald)
September 17, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10-12-07. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 9-17-07. (mfj)
September 12, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/12/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/12/2007. (cap)
September 5, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 18, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Teresa C Huff. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/9/2007, answer due 9/7/2007. (Bishop, Donald)
July 12, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant(Referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
June 29, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
June 29, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as June 25, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on June 27, 2007. (ct)
June 29, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teresa C Huff. (ct)
June 29, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Teresa C Huff. Filed nunc pro tunc as of June 25, 2007(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa C Huff
Represented By: Donald E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?