Devine v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Sharon R Devine
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03036
Filed: August 22, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 13 Featured Case ORDER: granting Plaintiff's motion 9 for attorneys fees, and awarding Fees, in the amount of $1,723.78, under the Equal Access to Justice Act, against Social Security Administration Commissioner, and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 29, 2008. (sh)
December 2, 2008 Honorable Barry A. Bryant no longer assigned to case. (lw)
December 2, 2008 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Sharon R Devine. Objections to R&R due by 12/19/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 2, 2008. (lw)
November 17, 2008 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 11, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rw)
November 11, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Sharon R Devine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed contract, # 2 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 3 Exhibit "A" - Sam Boyce, # 4 Exhibit "B" - Davis Duty, # 5 Exhibit "C" - Anthony Bartels, # 6 Exhibit "D" - Donald Bishop, # 7 Exhibit "E" - Lewis Huddle, # 8 Exhibit "F" - Bart Virden, # 9 Exhibit "G" - James Roy, # 10 Affidavit of Counsel, # 11 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 12 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court, # 13 Affidavit of Plaintiff)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 11, 2008 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Sharon R Devine. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 13, 2008 8 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 7 Report and Recommendations and reversing and remanding case to Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g)(2006). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 13, 2008. (lw)
July 23, 2008 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Sharon R Devine. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 23, 2008. (ct)
January 8, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 18, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Sharon R Devine. (Spencer, Frederick)
November 21, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or December 18, 2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 21, 2007. (lmg)
November 15, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/18/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/17/2008. (cnn)
November 13, 2007 4 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 10, 2007 TEXT ONLY REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant as referral. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
August 22, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
August 22, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing that the complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/16/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 8/20/07. (ct)
August 22, 2007 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon R Devine. (ct)
August 22, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Sharon R Devine. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/16/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devine v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon R Devine
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?