Rider v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Beverly Rider
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03042
Filed: September 24, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER adopting 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto and awarding Plaintiff's 12 Attorney Fees in the amount of $2,152.89 as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 12, 2008. (mfr)
November 5, 2008 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA filed by Beverly Rider. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 5, 2008. (lw)
October 6, 2008 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Delaney R&R, # 2 Exhibit B Edmonson R&R)(Hawkins, Claude)
September 23, 2008 16 AFFIDAVIT filed by Beverly Rider Plaintiff's Affidavit. (Bishop, Donald)
September 22, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(rw)
September 22, 2008 15 AFFIDAVIT filed by Beverly Rider Plaintiff's Attorney's Affidavit with time itemized. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EAJA time by Attorney)(Bishop, Donald)
September 22, 2008 14 *** PLEASE DISREGARD INCORRECT DOCUMENT FILED. SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 16***AFFIDAVIT filed by Beverly Rider Plaintiff's Affidavit. (Bishop, Donald) Modified on 9/23/2008 to note correction of filing(lw).
September 22, 2008 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion for EAJA Fees by Beverly Rider. (Bishop, Donald)
September 22, 2008 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA by Beverly Rider. (Bishop, Donald)
July 17, 2008 11 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS reversing Commissioner decision and REMANDING CASE to commissioner for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 17, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
June 25, 2008 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Beverly Rider. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 25, 2008. (ct)
February 22, 2008 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 24, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File brief and allowing until 2/22/08 to file brief. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 24, 2008. (ct)
January 22, 2008 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 24, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Beverly Rider. (Bishop, Donald)
November 30, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 12/31/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 11/30/2007. (caz)
November 29, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/2/2008. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/31/2008. (mfr)
November 29, 2007 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 22, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint, filed by Beverly Rider. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/1/2007, answer due 11/30/2007. (Bishop, Donald)
September 24, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General w/mag ntc attached and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
September 24, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Beverly Rider; granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Beverly Rider and directing that the complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/18/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 19, 2007. (ct)
September 24, 2007 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Rider. (ct)
September 24, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Beverly Rider.Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/18/07(ct) Modified on 9/24/2007 to correct docket text(ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rider v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Rider
Represented By: Donald E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?