Swanson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Steven H. Swanson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03050
Filed: October 17, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 13 JUDGMENT: finding in favor of the Commissioner Social Security Administration and against the Plaintiff Steven H. Swanson, and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 29, 2008. (sh)
December 4, 2008 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Steven H. Swanson. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 4, 2008. (sh)
May 22, 2008 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 21, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File brief until May 23, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 21, 2008. (tg)
April 18, 2008 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 28, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 28, 2008. (dmc)
March 25, 2008 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File SSA Appeal Brief by Steven H. Swanson. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Spencer, Frederick)
March 25, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Steven H. Swanson. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 25, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/24/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 02/25/2008. (caz)
February 22, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
February 22, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 16, 2008 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Steven H. Swanson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/28/2007, answer due 2/26/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - service of Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit "B" - service of U. S. Atty General, # 3 Exhibit "C" - service of U. S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 17, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
October 17, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Steven H. Swanson and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 15, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 16, 2007. (tg)
October 17, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Steven H. Swanson. (tg)
October 17, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc October 15, 2007 filed by Steven H. Swanson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. Swanson
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?