Dodson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Randall E. Dodson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03051
Filed: October 17, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is not adopted and plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation are sustained; further granting plaintiff's motion to remand and remanding case to the Comissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence six. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 4, 2009. (rw)
November 10, 2008 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 30, 2008 12 OBJECTION(S) by Randall E. Dodson re 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Randall E. Dodson.. (Spencer, Frederick)
October 30, 2008 11 MOTION to Remand by Randall E. Dodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 21, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations are due October 30, 2008. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. (kcg)
October 20, 2008 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Randall E. Dodson. by Randall E. Dodson. (Spencer, Frederick)
October 9, 2008 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Randall E. Dodson. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 9, 2008. (sh)
March 26, 2008 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 3, 2008 7 Appellant's BRIEF by Randall E. Dodson. Appellee Brief due by 3/21/2008. (Spencer, Frederick)
February 1, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/3/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 02/01/2008. (cla)
February 1, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
January 31, 2008 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 15, 2008 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Randall E. Dodson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/27/2007, answer due 2/25/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Service on Regional Chief, # 2 Exhibit B - Service on U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit C - Service on U.S. Attorney)(Spencer, Frederick)
October 17, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
October 17, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 11, 2007, filed by Randall E. Dodson. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2007. (tg)
October 17, 2007 3 Featured Case ***DISREGARD WRONG PDF ATTACHED***ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 11, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2007. (tg) Modified on 10/17/2007 (tg).
October 17, 2007 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randall E. Dodson. (tg) Modified on 10/19/2007 to add text (tg).
October 17, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of October 11, 2007, filed by Randall E. Dodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall E. Dodson
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?