Harris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2007cv03060
Filed: December 4, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 9 and granting Motion for Attorney Fees, in the amount of $1,467.03, under athe Equal Access to Justice Act, filed by Plaintiff Anthony E. Harris. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 28, 2009. (sh)
April 27, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Anthony E. Harris. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 27, 2009. (sh)
January 7, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 , JUDGMENT in favor of Anthony E. Harris against Social Security Administration Commissioner, and this matter is reversed and remanded for further development of the record pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 7, 2009. (sh)
December 16, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Anthony E. Harris. Objections to R&R due by 1/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 16, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?