Csiszer et al v. Wren et al

Plaintiff: Rozanna Csiszer and Charles Csiszer
Defendant: Mary R. Wren, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc., Continental Casualty Company, Perry L. Wilbur and Perry L Wilbur
Case Number: 3:2008cv03011
Filed: January 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 259 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 30, 2009. (lw)
February 23, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on interrogatories finding for the Defendant's. That the Plaintiff's take nothing on their complaint filed herein and the matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All parties are to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 23, 2009. (lw)
February 9, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE; that the constitutionality of section 16-114-206 of the Arkansas Code, is drawn in question in the above captioned case, to which neither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State of Arkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 9, 2009. (lw) Modified on 2/9/2009 to correct text (lw).
January 30, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CERTIFICATE: re 136 Certificate, that the constitutionality of section 15(b)of Act 649 of 2003, codified at section 16-55-212 of the ArkansasCode, is drawn in question in this case, to whichneither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State ofArkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 30, 2009. (lw)
January 29, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE; that the constitutionality of section 16-114-207 of the Arkansas Code, is drawn in question in this case, to which neither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State of Arkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 29, 2009. (lw)
January 22, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 82 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 22, 2009. (lw)
January 8, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting nos. 5, 6, 9, 11, 15, 16, 17, denying nos. 19, 20, 21, 22 and finding as moot nos. 8, 14, 49 Motion to Quash; as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 8, 2009. (lw)
December 10, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The court has reviewed the documents in camera and finds that the document are protected by the peer review provisions of Ark. Code. Ann. Section 16-46-105 and that the Plaintiff's Motion to Com pel Request for Production numbers 3,4 and 45 is hereby DENIED with regards to the documents provided to the court for in camera review. The documents are furthered order to be sealed by the clerk and subject to review only by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 10, 2008. (lw)
November 25, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 31 Motion to Compel; 33 Motion to Compel; 23 Motion to Compel; and 29 Motion to Compel as set forth. Further granting 42 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,that the Defendant's deadline for deposing experts is hereby extended to 1/19/09 and Plaintiff's are given 21 days from the date of receipt of the slides and tissue samples to obtain an expert report from their expert(s). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 25, 2008. (lw)
November 13, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. and Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice.. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 13, 2008. (rw)
September 11, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 11, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Csiszer et al v. Wren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozanna Csiszer
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Csiszer
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary R. Wren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry L. Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry L Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?