LaRue v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Wayne L. LaRue
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2008cv03044
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Boone
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Reversing and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of USC 405(g). ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 11 , and ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 5, 2010. (sh)
December 2, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 2, 2009. (sh)
October 8, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Wayne L. LaRue. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 8, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRue v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne L. LaRue
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?