Jodie Riggs v. Transportation Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jodie Riggs
Defendant: Transportation Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv03058
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Renewed Motion for Award of Costs. Defendant is hereby awarded costs as against Plaintiff in the amount of $5,247.07. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 11, 2011. (lw)
June 1, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's 63 Motion for an Award of Costs; further defendant has 14 days from the entry of the Court of Appeal's decision to re-file its motion for an Award of Costs. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 1, 2010. (rw)
December 2, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 2, 2009. (lw)
September 28, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: that Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant should be dismissed in its entirety and the claims set forth therein should be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 28, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jodie Riggs v. Transportation Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Riggs
Represented By: Jerry Dean Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?