Frederick v. Jenkins et al

Plaintiff: Troy Frederick
Defendant: Nathan Jenkins, Jeremy Watson, Contreras and J Brisco
Case Number: 3:2009cv03022
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 24 Memorandum Opinion and granting defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case based on plaintiff's failure to prosecute and failure to obey the order of the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 23, 2009. (rw)
August 11, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to file motion for summary judgment on or before 10/23/09. Plaintiff is directed not to respond to the motion for summary judgment until so ordered by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 11, 2009. (lw)
April 15, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 15, 2009. (lw)
March 13, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer this case to the U.S. Distsrict Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/13/09. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 3/13/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?