Adams

Plaintiff: Dale B Adams
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc., Debbie Frost, James D Smith, Leland E Tollett, Mark Graham and Artee Williams
Case Number: 3:2009cv03054
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 183 plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Clarification of Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline 184 , and granting 185 , defendant's Motion for Protective Order. It is ordered that defendant is not require d to respond to any discovery remaining outstanding other than those discovery requests that defendant has agreed to respond to as stated herein. This matter is set for a JURY TRIAL to begin in Harrison, Arkansas on APRIL 11, 2011. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2011. (sh)
January 7, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 175 , and 177 , Motions for Applications for Subpoenas Ducas Tecum. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 7, 2011. (sh)
August 30, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. That the Defendant's objection is overruled; for reasons set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation: the Defendant's 38 Motion to Dismiss filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., 81 Motion to Dismiss filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., 138 Report and Recommendations, and 50 Motion to Dismiss filed by Tyson Foods, Inc. are denied. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 30, 2010. (lw)
April 19, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; The Court, being well and sufficiently advised, cautions the plaintiff that future filings in this matter will not be accepted by facsimile. Except under extenuating circumstances, the office of the Clerk of this Court does not accept facsimile filings and will not routinely do so. Please take note of this policy and follow it in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 19, 2010. (lw)
April 13, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and that all claims against Leland E Tollett, Debbie Trost, Artee Williams, Mark Graham and James D Smith should be, and hereby are, dismissed; and, that all claims under the Serbanes-Oxley Act should be, and hereby are, dismissed; and that all claims under 42 U.S.C 1981 should be, and hereby are, dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 13, 2010. (lw)
February 22, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Judicial Inquiry and/or Administrative Investigation of the EEOC. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 22, 2010. (lw)
February 18, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Stay; taking under advisement 25 Motion to Amend/Correct; and granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, the plaintiff has up through 3/11/10. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 18, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale B Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland E Tollett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?