Armstrong v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Linda J. Armstrong
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2010cv03005
Filed: January 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Erin L. Setser
Referring Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,330.00 plus $52.85 in costs. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 6, 2011. (lw)
March 18, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE to Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the opinion, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 18, 2011. (lw)
July 9, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; Government SSA Appeal Brief due on 8/11/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on July 9, 2010. (lw)
January 14, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 1/12/10. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receip t requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 14, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Armstrong
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?