Reagan et al v. Dunaway Timber Company et al

Plaintiff: Teri Reagan and Maverick Transportation, LLC.
Defendant: Dunaway Timber Company, Henry Christ, Morgan Quisenberry, John Doe Trucking and John Doe Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2010cv03016
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that plaintiff Teri Reagan shall have and recover from defendants total compensatory damages in the amount of $2,000,000.00; further ordered that Brandie Reagan shall have and recover from defendants total compensatory damages in the am ount of $1,000,000.00; further ordered that the Estate of Roger Reagan, Deceased, shall have and recover from defendants total compensatory damages in the amount of $3,000,000.00; further plaintiff Maverick and defendants stipulated at tria l and it's ordered that plaintiff Maverick shall have and recover from defendants total compensatory damages in the stipulated amount of $93,301.82; further defendant Dunaway is liable for the total amount of damages of $7,093.301.82 a ssessed by the jury in favor of the plaintiffs and judgment amounts shall bear interest at the prevailing legal rate of 0.12% per annum from the date of the entry of this Order until paid; further ordered that in accordance with the jury's verdict, the third-party claims of defendants against third-party defendant Barry McCoy are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fee. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 16, 2011. (rw)
November 3, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as set forth. Further denying 130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, at this time. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 3, 2011. (lw)
October 31, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Teri Reagan's Motion to Exclude Clint Evans 110 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant Barry McCoys Motion to Excuse Appearance 113 is GRANTED. McCoy is excused from appearing at trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Bifurcate 116 isGRANTED. Any portion of the trial concerning punitive damages will be bifurcated from proceedings concerning compensatory damages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that McCoys Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims [ 119] is GRANTED. McCoys cross claims are DISMISSED under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2)and 41(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Continue 122 is DENIED. This matter remains set for trial to begin at 9:00 AM in Harrison on November 2, 2011. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 31, 2011. (mfr)
July 20, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion in Limine; granting 57 Motion in Limine; granting 58 Motion in Limine; denying 59 Motion in Limine; granting 60 Motion in Limine; denying 61 Motion in Limine; granting 62 Mot ion in Limine; denying 63 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion in Limine; denying 66 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 91 Motion in Limine; denying 93 Motion in Limine, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on July 20, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reagan et al v. Dunaway Timber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Reagan
Represented By: Jose M. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Transportation, LLC.
Represented By: Jose M. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunaway Timber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?