Brown v. Watson et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Defendant: Yolanda Watson, Mike Pippin, Kent Villines, Mike Thomas, Jeff Tillman, Dan Roberts, Dave Eberhard, James L. Williams, Department of Community Correction, Harrison, City of and Harrison Probation and Parole Services
Case Number: 3:2010cv03080
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal and directing Clerk to assess the filing fee of $455.00 and collect funds from Prison Account of Daniel Ray Brown. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 30, 2013. (sh)
July 12, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, the Court directs that the clerk send a copy of the IFP application (prisoner form) to Plainatiff as the prior application cannot be located. The copy of this Order should be sent certified mail, return receipt requested. The Court directs that Jail Administrator Jason Day assist the Plaintiff by completing the jail account certification part of the application. The application should be returned to this Court by no later than July 26, 2013. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 12, 2013. (sh)
May 3, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 in forma pauperis status, the Court directs the Clerk to send the Plaintiff an IFP form, and Plaintiff is given until May 24, 2013 to file the completed IFP application with this Court. Failure to obey the order of the Court will result in an order being entered advising the Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit that Plaintiff is not eligible for IFP status. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 3, 2013. (sh)
March 13, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 61 and granting re 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Civil Case dismissed with prejudice and terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 13, 2013. (sh)
February 25, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 57 Motion for Court Assistance; denying re 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying as moot re 59 Motion to provide documents, ; denying 59 and denying as moot Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Court direct s the Clerk to send the Plaintiff a docket sheet, and if plaintiff wants to request copies of specific document he may do so; however, the Court will not send him a copy of ALL documents that have been filed in this case without a showing of good cause. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 25, 2013. (sh)
October 1, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 51 Report and Recommendations, as set forth. The clerk is directed to send a copy of the questionnaire, document 49 , to the plaintiff. Plaintiff's response must be filed by 11/1/12. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 1, 2012. (lw)
September 27, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the defendants to file a summary judgment motion by December 21, 2011. When the motion is filed, plaintiff will be asked to verify his receipt of the motion and notify the court of how he intends to respond. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 27, 2011. (sh)
July 7, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, defendants have through 7/15/11 to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint. Further ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 7, 2011. (lw)
December 14, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 10 Motion for Order; terminating 12 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 13 Motion to Withdraw Motion; granting 14 Motion to Amend/Correct, the clerk is directed to file the motion as a supplemental complaint. Further denying 15 Motion for Special Report. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 14, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pippin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Villines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Eberhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Probation and Parole Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?