Horton v. Loggins et al

Plaintiff: Brady Lee Horton
Defendant: Jerry Loggins, Joey Pruitt, Dewayne Pierce, Derek Harmon and Jose Abiseid
Case Number: 3:2010cv03082
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further the Plaintiff's complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 23, 2011. (lw)
November 29, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; as to 10 Motion to Supplement, plaintiff cannot add claims arising after case was filed. Granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Amend/Correct, the clerk is directed to note on the docket sh eet that Ms. Blair has been made a defendant and file document 11 as an amended complaint. The Court hereby directs the USMS to serve Defendant Blair without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant has (21) days from the date of service to answer. Further denying 22 Motion to Seal. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 29, 2010. (lw) Modified on 11/29/2010 to add text(lw). (cc: USMS)
October 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds in the amount of $350.00 from Prison Account of Brady Lee Horton; Further, DIRECTING SERVICE on Derek Harmon, Jose Abiseid, Jerry Loggins, Dewayne Pierce, and Joey Pruitt and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 5, 2010. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw) Modified on 10/5/2010 to add Jose Abiseid (lw).
August 23, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Harrison Division. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/23/10. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 8/23/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Loggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Lee Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Abiseid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?