Chapman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Denise K. Chapman and Jonathan Chapman
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv03109
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2012 Filing 62 MANDATE of USCA affirming district court decision as to #58 Notice of Appeal (atty), filed by Jonathan Chapman, Denise K. Chapman. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment, #2 USCA Opinion)(lw)
January 20, 2012 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #56 as moot Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 20, 2012. (smt)
January 18, 2012 Filing 61 USCA Scheduling Order as to #58 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Jonathan Chapman, Denise K. Chapman. Case Appealed to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 12-1114. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(jn)
January 17, 2012 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 5002754 re #58 Notice of Appeal (atty), Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Jonathan Chapman, Denise K. Chapman. (src)
January 17, 2012 TEXT ONLY NOTICE TO USCA of subsequent case activity Related entry(s): USCA Appeal Fees. (src)
January 13, 2012 Filing 60 NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re #58 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Jonathan Chapman, Denise K. Chapman. (jn)
January 13, 2012 Filing 59 APPEAL NOTICE to Counsel and Pro Se Parties re #58 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Jonathan Chapman, Denise K. Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Form A, #2 Appeal Form B, #3 Transcript Order Form, #4 Prehearing Conference Program)(jn)
January 13, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #55 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick) (cc via ECF: Edwin Lowther, Paul Morris, Frederick Spencer, Michael Thompson) Modified on 1/13/2012 to add distribution info(jn).
January 12, 2012 Filing 57 ***DISREGARD- ATTORNEY WILL REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT*** NOTICE by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman of Appeal to the 8th Circuit (Spencer, Frederick) Modified on 1/13/2012 to add text(jn).
December 23, 2011 Filing 56 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #54 Response to Motion of Defendant filed 12/13/11 by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying plaintiffs #53 re Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Order entered on 11/29/11. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 16, 2011. (sh)
December 13, 2011 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #53 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and Grant Relief to Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
December 9, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and Grant Relief to Order by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spencer, Frederick)
December 9, 2011 Filing 52 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCUMENT TO BE FILED WITH APPROPRIATE SIGNATURE. PLEASE see document #53 .*** MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and Grant Relief to Order by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spencer, Frederick) Modified on 12/9/2011 to add docket text (mfr).
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #47 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 29, 2011. (sh)
November 7, 2011 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #48 Response to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
November 7, 2011 Filing 49 ***PLEASE DISREGARD WRONG PDF ATTACHED - SEE DOCUMENT #50.***MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #48 Response to Motion, (Document No. 47-Motion) by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael) Modified on 11/8/2011 to note document refiled(rw).
November 7, 2011 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Grant Relief to Order ; #46 Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; MOTION to Alter Judgment and Grant Relief to Order ; #46 Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
October 26, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Grant Relief to Order ; #46 Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; by Denise K. Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Spencer, Frederick)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #38 Motions for Hearing #40 and #44 and Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Granting #15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on July 19, 2011. (sh)
July 18, 2011 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Depositions Disc. Ext. & Depo Deadline filed by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
July 15, 2011 Filing 44 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Depositions by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
June 1, 2011 Filing 43 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/14/2011 at 09:00 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III. Amended order filed to reflect a jury trial in lieu of a bench trial. All deadlines as set out in the original Final Scheduling Order dated March 8, 2011 remain in effect. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 1, 2011. (jas)
May 31, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #37 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on May 31, 2011. (smt)
May 18, 2011 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 First MOTION for Leave to and Showing of Good Cause filed by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
May 18, 2011 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 Amended MOTION for Hearing re #38 First MOTION for Hearing re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
May 16, 2011 Filing 40 Amended MOTION for Hearing re #38 First MOTION for Hearing re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 16, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Thompson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Thompson, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 38 First MOTION for Hearing re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 13, 2011 Filing 37 First MOTION for Leave to and Showing of Good Cause by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 9, 2011 ***DISREGARD*** Entered in error*** Motion #35 terminated as moot.*** TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's deadline to file a Reply is extended to May 13, 2011. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on May 9, 2011. (jlg) Modified text on 5/9/2011 (jas).
May 6, 2011 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Reply, Motion for New Trial, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to the Reply, Wolfgang Reinhart, Natl Highway Traffic Safety Admin, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to the Reply, Traffic Safety & Nuisance Research Institute,, #4 Exhibit Ex. D to the Reply, Paul Marriner & John Granery,, #5 Exhibit Ex. E to the Reply, 2011 NHTSA Executive Summary, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, 2011 NHTSA Field Inspections)(Lowther, Edwin)
May 5, 2011 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
April 29, 2011 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 13, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 14)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 11, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 12)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 9, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 10)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 7, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 8)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 5, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 6)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 4)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Part 2)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit H Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H Part 2)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 3)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 2)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F Part 3)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman to #21 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C part 2)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 29, 2011 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 22, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 29, 2011. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on April 22, 2011. (jlg)
April 21, 2011 Filing 20 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
April 14, 2011 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
April 14, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 22, 2011. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on April 14, 2011. (jlg)
April 4, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 15, 2011. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on April 4, 2011. (jlg)
April 1, 2011 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 25, 2011 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
March 25, 2011 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
March 25, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
March 24, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul D. Morris.. (Morris, Paul)
March 8, 2011 Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/14/2011 at 09:00 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III.Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on March 8, 2011. (jas)
March 2, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 12/14/2011 09:00 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Paul K. Holmes III. (gg)
March 2, 2011 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case Reassigned to Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III. Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren no longer assigned to the case. (gg)
February 2, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Deadline. Telephone conference cancelled, to be rescheduled. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 2, 2011. (gg)
January 31, 2011 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2011 01:30 PM before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren to discuss the parties' Rule 26(f) Reports. (acm)
January 24, 2011 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Spencer, Frederick)
January 24, 2011 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
January 3, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. The parties shall have until January 24, 2011, to file their Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 3, 2011. (acm)
December 30, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Ford Motor Company. (Lowther, Edwin)
December 21, 2010 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. Ford Motor Company served on 11/4/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 22, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Morris on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Morris, Paul)
November 22, 2010 Filing 7 DEMAND for Twelve Person Jury by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick) Modified event and text on 11/29/2010 (jn).
November 22, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Twelve Person Jury Request Jury Trial by Denise K. Chapman, Jonathan Chapman. (Spencer, Frederick)
November 19, 2010 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Scheduling Order issue date 1/20/2011. Bench Trial set for 12/14/2011 08:30 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 19, 2010. (gg)
November 17, 2010 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Ford Motor Company.(lw)
November 17, 2010 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Denise K. Chapman and Jonathan Chapman, in the Circuit Court of Baxter County, Arkansas, 11/2/10, case number CV-2010-326-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit A Deposition of William Koeppel)(lw)
November 17, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ford Motor Company. (lw)
November 17, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court of Baxter County, Arkansas, case number CV-2010-326-1. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 2006770), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A-1 Letters of Administration, #4 Exhibit A Deposition of William Koeppel)(lw)
November 17, 2010 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lw)
November 17, 2010 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Ford Motor Company. Answer to Complaint #4 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Paul D. Morris. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise K. Chapman
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Chapman
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Paul D. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?