Eastwood v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Vincent Eastwood
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv03075
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 108 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Attorney Fees, in favor of Vincent Eastwood against Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company in the amount of $670,042.50 in attorney's fees, $9,164.62 in costs and expenses, and $3,000.00 for Class Representative's service fee. Case is Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 7, 2014. (src)
December 13, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 78 Motion for leave to return checks not negotiated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 13, 2013. (lw)
June 5, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED. Amended Final Scheduling Order will be issued and new jury trial date will be set. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 5, 2013. (jas)
November 5, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 5, 2012. (jas)
August 2, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 2, 2012. (lw)
July 19, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has two weeks from today's date, or until August 2, 2012, to request an extension of time to file a new Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 19, 2012. (adw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastwood v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Eastwood
Represented By: Bennett Scott Nolan
Represented By: William Gene Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?