Stephens v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Roger Kay Stephens
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2011cv03118
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Baxter
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss, all other motions and the Report and Recommendations are terminated as moot. Plaintiff's cause of action is hereby Dismissed Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 15, 2012. (lw)
December 20, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and MOTION for Service. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the order 4 by the specific date of 12/2/2011, to provide more information on his in forma pauperis application. As such plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiff is further directed to tender the filing fee of $350.00 by January 3, 2012. If plaintiff fails to comply his complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 20, 2011. (sh) Modified on 12/20/2011 to add text. (sh).
November 18, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that more information is needed to rule on 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roger Kay Stephens. The Plaintiff has on or before 12/2/11 to file an amended IFP application, should Plaintiff fail to comply within the required period of time, his compliant will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 18, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kay Stephens
Represented By: R. Theodor Stricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?