Stebbins v. Boone County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: David Stebbins
Defendant: Boone County, Arkansas and Jason Jones
Case Number: 3:2012cv03022
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 162 . Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 30, 2015. (jn)
January 16, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Compel; denying 110 Motion for Sanctions; denying 112 Motion for Subpoenas Duces Tecum ; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Subpoena ; denying 117 Motion to continue, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 16, 2014. (lw)
November 26, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 109 of the Magistrate denying Mr. Stebbins's renewed motion join parties is AFFIRMED. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 26, 2013. (sh)
September 18, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 18, 2013. (lw)
August 28, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 90 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 95 Motion for mental evaluation; DENYING 96 Motion to Disqualify. Plaintiff is ordered to provide information as requested in Defendants' first Motion to Compel, as well as a signed medical authorization, by September 6, 2013. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 28, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
July 9, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 79 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 9, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
August 13, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismisss separate Party Jason Jones and Jason Jones is Terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 13, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stebbins v. Boone County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?