Alexander v. Absolute Resolutions Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jason Alexander
Defendant: Mark Naiman, W. Anderson Woodford, Absolute Resolutions Corporation and Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03007
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Putative Class Action Complaint filed by Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. (Henry, Judy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to file reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 25, 2019. (ee)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Henry, Judy)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Putative Class Action Complaint filed by Jason Alexander. (McGaha, Corey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/29/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 28, 2019. (slc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly W. Tucker on behalf of Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. (Tucker, Kimberly)
February 26, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. Motion to Dismiss #9 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Kimberly W. Tucker. (src)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss Putative Class Action Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. (Henry, Judy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Putative Class Action Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Mark Naiman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Henry, Judy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver by Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC, W. Anderson Woodford of . (Bacon, Donald)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint - Class Action, filed by Jason Alexander. Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGaha, Corey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint - Class Action, filed by Jason Alexander. Absolute Resolutions Corporation served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGaha, Corey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC, Mark Naiman, W. Anderson Woodford and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Crowder on behalf of Jason Alexander. (Crowder, William)
January 25, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1856109.. (McGaha, Corey)
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/28/2019 (lgd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jason Alexander. (lgd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Absolute Resolutions Corporation, Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC, Mark Naiman, W. Anderson Woodford, filed by Jason Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Absolute Resolutions Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Naiman
Represented By: Kimberly W. Tucker
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Anderson Woodford
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Resolutions Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly W. Tucker
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Alexander
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey D. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?