Wallis v. Watkins

Plaintiff: James Casey Wallis
Defendant: Nurse J. Watkins
Case Number: 3:2019cv03026
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by J. Watkins.(Lewis, Kaylen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Casey Wallis. J. Watkins served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (lgd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to J. Watkins and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #12 Order Directing Service, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lgd)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE J. Watkins and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 13, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Carroll County to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $30.00; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Carroll County). (tg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 13, 2019. (mlf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983).. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 13, 2019. (mlf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ $350.00. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 13, 2019. (mlf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by James Casey Wallis. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 30, 2019. (lgd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Casey Wallis. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to provisionally file the complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address and ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed.( Completed IFP due by 5/3/2019). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 15, 2019. (tg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by James Casey Wallis. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Nurse J. Watkins, filed by James Casey Wallis.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallis v. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse J. Watkins
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Casey Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?