First National Bank of North Arkansas v. Knox et al
Plaintiff: First National Bank of North Arkansas
Defendant: Lisa Ann Hammons, USDA Farm Service Agency and Paul Arden Knox, II
Case Number: 3:2019cv03029
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #7 Motion to Extend. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (lgd)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Creed, Seth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by First National Bank of North Arkansas. (Campbell, Heather)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 Separate Defendant USDA Farm Service Agency's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Separate Defendant USDA Farm Service Agency's responsive pleading must be filed on or before MAY 22, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 23, 2019. (slc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Creed, Seth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
April 22, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with exhibits filed in State Court against Lisa Ann Hammons, Paul Arden Knox, II and USDA Farm Service Agency, filed by First National Bank of North Arkansas.(tg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by USDA Farm Service Agency. (tg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Carroll County, case number 08ECV-18-152., filed by USDA Farm Service Agency. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Bank of North Arkansas v. Knox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ann Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDA Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Seth Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Arden Knox, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Bank of North Arkansas
Represented By: Heather Ryan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?