Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C. v. Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.
Defendant: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03030
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 18) is extended to July 16, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 3, 2019. (jch)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Allen, H.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #20 Motion to Withdraw Filing. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 1, 2019. (jch)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Allen, H.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 8/22/2019 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 1, 2019. (slc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C. , filed by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Repair Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Repair & Maintenance Log, #3 Exhibit C - 80 FR 57291, #4 Exhibit D - 80 FR 57312, #5 Exhibit E - 80 FR 66788, #6 Exhibit F - 83 FR 13401, #7 Exhibit G - Kevin Tyler E-mails, #8 Exhibit H - Purchase Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Amendment 1 to Purchase Agreement, #10 Exhibit J - Amendment 2 to Purchase Agreement, #11 Exhibit K - Delivery Receipt & Bill of Sale)(Waddell, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #16 Response to Motion, by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Waddell, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kevin Tyler, #2 Exhibit B - N124HJ Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Francis "Chris" Freeman, Jr.)(Waddell, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff may file its second amended complaint by no later than June 26, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 25, 2019. (jch)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Waddell, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Waddell, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Waddell, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Waddell, Jr on behalf of Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Waddell, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to June 25, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 12, 2019. (ee)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.. (Carney, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Allen, H.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C. re #5 Answer to Complaint /Additional Defenses. (Carney, Mark)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/17/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 3, 2019. (slc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC.(Allen, H.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
April 24, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1904537.. (Allen, H.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Honda Aircraft Company, LLC, filed by Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C..(src)
April 24, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/26/2019 (src)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (src)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Baxter County, case number 03cv-19-62., filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C. v. Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honda Jet Limited, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark D. Carney
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Represented By: H. William Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?