Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc. v. Cameron Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc.
Defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv03034
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Patterson, Jerry)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. (Stallings, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. (Stallings, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/16/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 13, 2019. (slc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Cameron Mutual Insurance Company.(lgd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cameron Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5007021), filed by Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit state court summons)(lgd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. (lgd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court, case number 05CV-19-97. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 5007021), filed by Cameron Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State court complaint, summons and answer, #2 Exh B)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc. v. Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Evan Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nopalitos Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry Dean Patterson
Represented By: Johnny L. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?