West v. Ramsey et al
Plaintiff: Beverley West
Defendant: Judge Dale Ramsey and Third Judicial District Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv03054
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER; that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as set forth. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 15, 2019. (lw)
August 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #10 MOTION requesting to receive emails filed by Beverley West, #3 #9 MOTION for Service filed by Beverley West. Motions no longer referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(src)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 ***REVOKED***TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 8, 2019. (klk) Modified on 8/15/2019 IFP status revoked, as ordered in document #12 (lw).
August 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Beverley West, #10 MOTION requesting to receive emails filed by Beverley West. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION requesting to receive emails by Beverley West. (tg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Beverley West. (tg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint against Third Judicial District Court, Dale Ramsey, filed by Beverley West. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Beverley West.(tg) (tg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 17, 2019. (klk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With her complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, the application is incomplete because Plaintiff did not indicate if she has any gross pay or wages, and does not describe the other sources of income Plaintiff indicated she receives. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 17, 2019. (klk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to STRIKE the notice of lis pendens and attached description of real property from the Complaint at Doc. 1-1 and REMOVE THEM FROM THE DOCKET. The Court sua sponte strikes these documents as immaterial and impertinent, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 17, 2019. (ee)
July 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service filed by Beverley West. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to plaintiff/petitioner. (lgd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Beverley West. (lgd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Beverley West. (lgd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale Ramsey, Third Judicial District Court, filed by Beverley West. (Attachments STRICKEN PER TEXT ONLY ORDER ENTERED 7/17/2019: #1 Exhibit)(lgd) Modified on 7/17/2019 (src).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Ramsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Dale Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?