Banner Life Insurance Company v. Markowski et al
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Kyle T. Markowski, Kim P. Markowski and Kurtis M. Markowski
Case Number: 3:2019cv03056
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE in favor of Kim P. Markowski, Kurtis M. Markowski, Kyle T. Markowski against Banner Life Insurance Company in the amount of $250,000.00. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 27, 2019. (src)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER VACATING #9 Clerk's Order of Dismissal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 27, 2019. (ee)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***VACATED PER TEXT ONLY ORDER DATED 8/27/2019***CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Kim P. Markowski (CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) per TLB's chambers. (tg) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (lgd).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation and Motion for Dismissal by Kim P. Markowski. (Blair, H.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Lee Niblock on behalf of Kurtis M. Markowski, Kyle T. Markowski. (Niblock, Raymond)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/1/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 15, 2019. (slc)
August 14, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Kim P. Markowski. Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #5 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Johnny L Nichols. (src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint For Interpleader, COUNTERCLAIM against Banner Life Insurance Company by Kim P. Markowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy Schedule, #2 Exhibit B- Policy Confirmation)(Blair, H.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by H. David Blair on behalf of Kim P. Markowski. (Blair, H.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kim P. Markowski, Kurtis M. Markowski, Kyle T. Markowski ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5007056), filed by Banner Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lgd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Banner Life Insurance Company. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banner Life Insurance Company v. Markowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle T. Markowski
Represented By: Raymond Lee Niblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim P. Markowski
Represented By: H. David Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis M. Markowski
Represented By: Raymond Lee Niblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Kelly Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?