Criner v. Woods et al
Plaintiff: James Denis Criner
Defendant: Jody Woods, Jason Day, Southern Health Providers and Mike Moore
Case Number: 3:2019cv03058
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 17, 2019. (tg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS no longer at facility. Mail originally sent to James Denis Criner at Boone County Jail including #8 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed. No new address available. New Address due by 10/4/2019. (lgd)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 20, 2019. (lgd)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Boone County to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Boone County). (tg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 26, 2019. (smg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to Petitioner. (lgd)
July 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Denis Criner. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
July 25, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (lgd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00517. Docket sheet received.
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/25/2019. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 7/25/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Denis Criner. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/25/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Denis Criner. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Criner v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Denis Criner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?