Lackey v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Gina G. Lackey
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2019cv03068
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to SSA - U S Attorney for Western District of Arkansas for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sawyer, Deborah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to SSA - Chief Regional Counsel VI for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sawyer, Deborah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to SSA - Attorney General for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sawyer, Deborah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Gina G. Lackey. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Sawyer, Deborah)
September 10, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1978731.. (Sawyer, Deborah)
September 5, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/9/2019 (lgd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(lgd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT to Review Order of Social Security Administration Denying Disability Benefits against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Gina G. Lackey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Memo to ALJ, #2 Exhibit B - Attorney Brief to Appeals Council)(Sawyer, Deborah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Gina G. Lackey. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina G. Lackey
Represented By: Deborah A Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?