Turner v. USAA Federal Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Turner
Defendant: Alltran Financial, LP and USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv03004
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alltran Financial, LP.(White, Whitney)
February 21, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S #2 Complaint by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Davis, Frederick)
February 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David Krueger on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Krueger, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nora Cook on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Cook, Nora)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney L. White on behalf of Alltran Financial, LP. (White, Whitney)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nora K. Cook is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 18, 2020. (slc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David M. Krueger is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 18, 2020. (slc)
February 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Nora K. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2081035) by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Davis, Frederick)
February 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2080996) by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Davis, Frederick)
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. WHITNEY L. WHITE is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 10, 2020. (slc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT filed by Alltran Financial, LP Affidavit of Whitney L. White. (McPherson, Keith)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2075389) by Alltran Financial, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McPherson, Keith)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/13/2020 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 7, 2020. (slc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant Alltran Financial, LP's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Alltran Financial, LP's responsive pleading must be filed on or before FEBRUARY 21, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 5, 2020. (slc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Alltran Financial, LP. (McPherson, Keith)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Turner. Alltran Financial, LP served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Chami, David)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Davis, Frederick)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Federal Savings Bank.(Davis, Frederick)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Turner. USAA Federal Savings Bank served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Chami, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Alltran Financial, LP, USAA Federal Savings Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Alltran Financial, LP for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Chami, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to USAA Federal Savings Bank for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Chami, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alltran Financial, LP, USAA Federal Savings Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2052346), filed by Deborah Turner.(Chami, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Deborah Turner. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. USAA Federal Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltran Financial, LP
Represented By: Keith M. McPherson
Represented By: Whitney L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: David Krueger
Represented By: Nora Cook
Represented By: Frederick H. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Turner
Represented By: David Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?