Eldridge v. Pace Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter "Pete&quot Eldridge
Defendant: Pace Industries, Inc. and Pace Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03038
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC. (Gary, James)
May 14, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2141495.. (Gary, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER STAYING CASE due to the Defendants' Chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a)(1). Defendants' notice (Doc. 8) indicates that the Court's imposition of a stay due to bankruptcy is appropriate. Defendants' counsel is DIRECTED to provide a status update to the Court regarding the progress of bankruptcy proceedings in the next 90 days, or by August 10, 2020, and then every 90 days thereafter until bankruptcy proceedings have been concluded. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 12, 2020. (ee)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by All Defendants (Gary, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC. (Gary, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James Matthew Gary on behalf of All Defendants. (Gary, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 12, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/14/2020 (lgd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC.(lgd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC, filed by Peter "Pete" Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 summons issued)(lgd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC. (lgd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court, case number 05CV-20-111., filed by Pace Industries, Inc., Pace Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eldridge v. Pace Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter "Pete&quot Eldridge
Represented By: Steven R. McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Industries, LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?