Laufer et al v. Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erich Laufer, Amy Swann and James Johnson
Defendant: Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC, Michael Lunsford and Clint Mickle
Case Number: 3:2020cv03055
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by April Rheaume on behalf of James Johnson, Erich Laufer, Amy Swann. (Rheaume, April)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Lunsford, Clint Mickle, Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC. (Orcutt, Amanda)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/27/2020 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 11, 2020. (slc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Read on behalf of All Defendants. (Read, Nathan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Michael Lunsford, Clint Mickle, Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC.(Orcutt, Amanda)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Gale Orcutt on behalf of All Defendants. (Orcutt, Amanda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Michael Lunsford, Clint Mickle, Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC, Michael Lunsford, Clint Mickle for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2201829), filed by Erich Laufer, Amy Swann, James Johnson.(Sanford, Josh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by James Johnson, Erich Laufer, Amy Swann. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer et al v. Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plant Family Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: Amanda Gale Orcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lunsford
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: Amanda Gale Orcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Mickle
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: Amanda Gale Orcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erich Laufer
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: April Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Swann
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: April Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: April Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?