Henderson v. Robertson et al
Case Number: 3:2021cv03081
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Harrison Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint and Completed IFP be filed. Amended Complaint due by 12/23/2021 Completed IFP due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 2, 2021. (lgd)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to the Harrison Division, Case No. 21-3081. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 2, 2021. (lgd)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01169. Docket sheet received.
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/01/2021. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 12/1/2021.]
December 1, 2021 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Arkansas Eastern District. (lgd)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dewayne C Henderson.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 12/1/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dewayne C Henderson. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 12/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?