Johnson v. Woods
Plaintiff: Angela Faye Johnson
Defendant: Nurse Jody Woods
Case Number: 3:2022cv03009
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jody Woods and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #13 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). (bjb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jody Woods and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 14, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(bjb)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for Nurse Jody Woods. (Lewis, Kaylen)
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Faye Johnson. Jody Woods served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (tg)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Set Aside. Service was made via certified mail to the Boone County Sheriff's Office. Defendant Jody Woods is no longer employed there.Counsel is given until April 15, 2022, to either accept service of behalf of Ms. Woods or provide the Court with her service address. The service address may be filed under seal. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 31, 2022. (smg) Modified on 4/1/2022 to add text(tg).
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Set Aside Service of Process by Jody Woods. (Lewis, Kaylen)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Set Aside Service of Process by Jody Woods. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Lewis, Kaylen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jody Woods and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #6 Order Directing Service. (lgd)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing the USMS to Serve Nurse Jody Woods and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 22, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Boone County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Boone County Jail). (tg) (tg).
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 18, 2022. (tg)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Angela Faye Johnson. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Nurse Jody Woods, filed by Angela Faye Johnson.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Faye Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jody Woods
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?