Sasser v. Hobbs

Case Number: 4:2000cv04036
Filed: March 30, 2000
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 221 Motion to Settle the Record; granting 234 Motion in Limine; denying 241 Motion for Order; denying 243 Motion in Limine; denying 246 Motion in Limine; denying 248 Motion in Limine; denying 250 Motion in Limine; denying 251 Motion in Limine. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 2, 2016. (mll)
February 1, 2016 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Amended Motion for Approval of Issuance of Subpoena as to Charles Potter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 1, 2016. (mll)
January 26, 2016 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to file an amended motion for approval of issuance of subpoenas. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 26, 2016. (mll)
September 2, 2015 213 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 211 Order granting Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 2, 2015. (mll)
September 1, 2015 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 206 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 1, 2015. (mll)
March 3, 2015 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Arkansas Board of Parole to produce institutional file of Andrew Sasser. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 3, 2015. (mll)
September 7, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 164 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Andrew Sasser. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 7, 2011. (cap)
November 3, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect Ray Hobbs as Director of the Arkansas Department of Correction; after conducting an evidentiary hearing on Sasser's mental retardation claim, finding that he is not mentally retarded as that condition is defined in Atkins v. Virginia, 536 U.S. 304 (2002) and that Sasser's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ECF No. 48, should be, and hereby is, DENIED. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 3, 2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sasser v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?