Dansby v. Norris

Petitioner: Joe Louis Dansby
Respondent: Larry Norris
Case Number: 4:2002cv04141
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2015 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 289 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 27, 2015. (mll)
August 14, 2014 281 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing as moot First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 14, 2014. (mll)
September 19, 2012 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 204 Motion in Limine, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 19, 2012. (lw)
August 31, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 31, 2009. (cap)
February 26, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 SEALED MOTION filed by Joe Louis Dansby. Currently scheduled evidentiary hearing set for March 16, 2009, is cancelled, and may be rescheduled at a later time. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 26, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dansby v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Louis Dansby
Represented By: Scott W. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Norris
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?