Perry v. Crane et al

Plaintiff: Michael R. Perry
Defendant: Mike Gray, Simeon Ames, Shawn Garland and Lori Jones
Case Number: 4:2007cv04013
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 82 Report and Recommendations and dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against defendant. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 4, 2009. (cap)
May 11, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Michael R. Perry; Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 11, 2009. (cnn)
September 10, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 39 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mike Gray, Lori Jones, Simeon Ames, Shawn Garland, denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael R. Perry. Defendants Lori Jones Simeon Ames and Shawn Garland terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 9, 2008. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Crane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gray
Represented By: Jacob Manning Hargraves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simeon Ames
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Garland
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Jones
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?