Cooper v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kirby Cooper
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv04036
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2007 19
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of a Magistrate, filed by all plaintiffs. Menu Foods Income Fund served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Hatfield, Jason) Modified on 6/27/2007 to correct service and answer date (cap).
May 24, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay. Proceedings in this matter are stayed pending a transfer decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 5/24/07. (cap)
May 17, 2007 16
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of a U.S.Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, filed by all plaintiffs. Menu Foods South Dakota Inc. served on 5/1/2007, answer due 5/21/2007. (Hatfield, Jason)
May 15, 2007 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall S. Ney on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Ney, Marshall)
May 8, 2007 7
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
April 30, 2007 4
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs. Menu Foods, Inc. served on 4/24/2007, answer due 5/14/2007. (Hatfield, Jason)
April 27, 2007 3
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 4/26/2007, answer due 5/16/2007. (Hatfield, Jason)
April 16, 2007 2
Transmittal of Documents - Copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint sent to Clerk, Judicial Panel on MDL (cap)
April 13, 2007 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with jury demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4000025.) filed by Kirby Cooper.(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Cooper
Represented By: Jason M. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?