Ward v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff John Ward, Jr. alleged that Defendant Rick Frenkel published false, scandalous and defamatory allegations about the Plaintiff on his Patent Troll Tracker blog.

Plaintiff: John Ward, Jr.
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Rick Frenkel
Case Number: 4:2008cv04022
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 185 SETTLEMENT ORDER - Parties settled, case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 11, 2010. (cap)
January 11, 2010 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Erin L. Setser: Telephone Conference (settlement conference follow-up) held on 1/11/2010. (Court Reporter (conf operator recorded) G Hellums, Ctrm Deputy) (gh)
January 11, 2010 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/11/2010 08:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 2nd flr (Rm 213) before Honorable Erin L. Setser. (gh)
January 7, 2010 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Honorable Erin L. Setser: Settlement Conference held on 1/7/2010 in Fayetteville. (gh)
January 5, 2010 184 MOTION to Compel Defendant's to Produce Documents Responsive to Requests in Ward's Third Set of Requests for Production by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex.A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 4, 2010 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re 166 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 4, 2010 182 REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protection From Defendant's Third Request for Production and "Third" Request for Admission and Brief in Support filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 23, 2009 177 RESPONSE to Motion re 166 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Babcock, Charles)
December 23, 2009 176 RESPONSE to Motion re 165 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protection From Defendant's Third Request for Production and "Third" Request for Admission and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Babcock, Charles)
December 22, 2009 175 RESPONSE to Motion re 165 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protection From Defendant's Third Request for Production and "Third" Request for Admission and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Babcock, Charles)
December 18, 2009 174 Featured Case ORDER denying 150 Motion for Reconsideration of motion to compel production of documents. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 18, 2009. (cnn)
December 17, 2009 173 RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (SUR-REPLY) filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 16, 2009 172 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: conference set for 1/7/2010 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 2nd flr (Rm 213) before Honorable Erin L. Setser. (gh)
December 11, 2009 171 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 MOTION to Quash and for Protection filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/14/2009 to add text (cap).
December 11, 2009 170 Amended MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Babcock, Charles)
December 10, 2009 169 SUR-REPLY by John Ward, Jr re 140 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J, # 11 Ex. K, # 12 Ex. L)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/14/2009 to add document link (cap).
December 10, 2009 168 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - PLEADING CONTAINED INCORRECT DATES AND WAS REFILED AS DOCUMENT 170 *** MOTION Substitute Expert by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 12/14/2009 to edit text (cap).
December 9, 2009 167 REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 152 MOTION to Quash and for Protection the Deposition Notice of Mark Chandler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schwarz, Kurt)
December 9, 2009 166 MOTION & BRIEF to Compel Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. A, # 3 Ex. B, # 4 Ex. C, # 5 Ex. D, # 6 Ex. E, # 7 Ex. F, # 8 Ex. G, # 9 Ex. H, # 10 Ex. I, # 11 Ex. J, # 12 Ex. K, # 13 Ex. L, # 14 Ex. M, # 15 Ex. N)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/9/2009 to add text (cap).
December 8, 2009 165 MOTION & BRIEF for Protective Order Plaintiff's Motion for Protection From Defendant's Third Request for Production and "Third" Request for Admission and Brief in Support by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D-1, # 5 Ex. D-2, # 6 Ex. E, # 7 Ex. F, # 8 Ex. G, # 9 Ex. H, # 10 Ex. I, # 11 Ex. J)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/9/2009 to add text (cap).
December 8, 2009 164 REPLY & BRIEF to Response to Motion re 150 MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 12/9/2009 to add text (cap).
December 3, 2009 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION to Quash and for Protection filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 1, 2009 162 Featured Case ORDER denying 151 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 1, 2009. (cnn)
November 30, 2009 161 RESPONSE in Opposition re 151 MOTION for Reconsideration re 133 Order Referring Motion, and Brief for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Based on Misrepresentations to the Court filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/1/2009 to delete duplicative text (cap).
November 30, 2009 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re 150 MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
November 30, 2009 159 REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 140 Response to Motion,,, Reply and Brief in Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Babcock, Charles)
November 27, 2009 158 SUR-REPLY by John Ward, Jr re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 11/30/2009 to add text (cap).
November 23, 2009 157 SUR-REPLY by John Ward, Jr re 120 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim Plaintiff's Sur-Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 11/24/2009 to edit text (cap).
November 23, 2009 156 SUR-REPLY & BRIEF re 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/24/2009 to edit text (cap).
November 23, 2009 155 SUR-REPLY & BRIEF in Opposition re 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/24/2009 to edit text (cap).
November 21, 2009 154 REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding the Scope of Cisco's Subject-Matter Waiver of Privilege filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 19, 2009 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 17, 2009 152 MOTION to Quash and for Protection by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Kurt)
November 17, 2009 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MOTIONS REFERRED: 151 MOTION for Reconsideration of 138 Order granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel re 133 Order Referring Motion, and Brief for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Based on Misrepresentations to the Court . Referred at the direction of the Court. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Setser.(cap) Modified on 11/18/2009 to delete duplicate text and add link (cap).
November 16, 2009 151 MOTION for Reconsideration of 138 Order granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel re 133 Order Referring Motion, and Brief for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Based on Misrepresentations to the Court by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/17/2009 to create document link (cap).
November 16, 2009 150 MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's 138 Order Denying Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/17/2009 to create document link (cap).
November 16, 2009 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Schwarz, Kurt)
November 15, 2009 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 15, 2009 147 REPLY to Response to Motion re 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 13, 2009 146 Featured Case ORDER denying 70 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 13, 2009. (tg)
November 13, 2009 145 REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 134 Response in Opposition to 120 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/16/2009 to create document link (cap).
November 9, 2009 144 RESPONSE to Motion re 121 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding the Scope of Cisco's Subject-Matter Waiver of Privilege and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Babcock, Charles)
November 9, 2009 143 Featured Case ORDER denying 78 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 9, 2009. (cnn)
November 6, 2009 142 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. Notice of Substitution of Exhibit "D" 139 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/9/2009 to create document link(cnn).
November 5, 2009 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - SEE DOCUMENT 140 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cisco Systems, Inc. (cap)
November 5, 2009 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex.A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex.D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 5, 2009 140 RESPONSE to Motion re 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cisco's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C, # 4 Exhibit 1D, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29)(Babcock, Charles)
November 5, 2009 139 RESPONSE to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Babcock, Charles)
November 5, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER. Items the Court ordered produced in the order entered on November 5, 2009 (Doc. 138) should be provided to defendant within 10 days. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 5, 2009. (Setser, Erin)
November 5, 2009 138 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 5, 2009. (cap)
November 4, 2009 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Erin L. Setser: Motion Hearing on Motion to Compel [doc 101] held on 11/4/2009. Court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Gina Hellums) (gh)
November 3, 2009 136 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena Served - John Noh (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 3, 2009 135 Featured Case ORDER re 133 Order Referring 101 Motion to Compel. By close of business today, Plaintiff is directed to submit Exhibit 14 to the undersigned for an in camera review. Plaintiff may submit the exhibit by e-mail to elsinfo@arwd.uscourts.gov, or by facsimile to 479-709-5421. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 3, 2009. (cap)
November 3, 2009 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2009 02:00 PM before Honorable Erin L. Setser. (gh) Modified on 11/4/2009 to note text only entry (cap).
November 2, 2009 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J, # 11 Ex. K, # 12 Ex. L, # 13 Ex. M, # 14 Ex. N)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 2, 2009 133 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 2, 2009. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Erin L. Setser.(cap)
November 2, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 131 Motion to Extend time to Respond to Monday, November 9, 2009. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 2, 2009. (cpg)
October 30, 2009 132 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena Served (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena)(Patton, Nicholas)
October 29, 2009 131 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding the Scope of Cisco's Subject-Matter Waiver of Privilege by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
October 28, 2009 130 CORRECTED SUR-REPLY & BRIEF by John Ward, Jr to 115 Reply to Response to 101 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/29/2009 to add text and document link (cap).
October 27, 2009 129 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - CORRECTED SUR-REPLY WHICH INCLUDES TABLE OF CONTENTS AND TABLE OF AUTHORITIES REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT 130 ***SUR-REPLY to 115 Reply to Response to Motion re 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/28/2009 to edit text and add link (cap). Modified on 10/29/2009 to note to disregard. NEF regenerated (cap).
October 23, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to October 27, 2009. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 23, 2009. (cpg)
October 23, 2009 128 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff John Ward, Jr to 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
October 22, 2009 127 PLEASE DISREGARD - ATTORNEY TO REFILE: MENDED DOCUMENT by John Ward, Jr. Amendment to 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation Amended Ex. A. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/23/2009 to reflect attorney will refile in pleading format, NEF regenerated (dmc).
October 22, 2009 126 MOTION and BRIEF to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Produced in Prior Litigation by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/23/2009 to reflect brief (dmc).
October 22, 2009 125 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Holmes on behalf of John Ward, Jr (Holmes, James)
October 21, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 122 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James Holmes is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2009. (cpg)
October 21, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to motions for summary judgment. Responsive pleadings are due on November 5, 2009. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2009. (cpg)
October 21, 2009 124 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 21, 2009 123 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/22/2009 to edit text (cap).
October 21, 2009 122 MOTION for James Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 19, 2009 121 MOTION & BRIEF for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding the Scope of Cisco's Subject-Matter Waiver of Privilege by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J, # 11 Ex. K, # 12 Ex. L, # 13 Ex. M, # 14 Ex. N, # 15 Ex. O, # 16 Ex. P)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/20/2009 to edit text (cap).
October 19, 2009 120 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 14, 2009 119 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 14, 2009 118 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 116 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Ward, Jr. See attached document for specifics. (cap)
October 14, 2009 117 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (cap)
October 13, 2009 116 MOTION & BRIEF for Summary Judgment by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 10/14/2009 to add text (cap).
October 13, 2009 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Babcock, Charles)
October 13, 2009 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition of Robert Chiaviello, # 2 Exhibit Deposition of John Ward, Jr.)(Schwarz, Kurt)
October 5, 2009 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J, # 11 Ex. K, # 12 Ex. L, # 13 Ex. M, # 14 Ex. N, # 15 Ex. O, # 16 Ex. P, # 17 Ex. Q, # 18 Ex. R, # 19 Ex. S)(Patton, Nicholas)
October 5, 2009 112 MANDATE (USCA) RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS denying as to 92 Petition for Writ of Mandamus Notice (USCA). (Attachments: # 1 8USCA Judgment)(cap)
October 5, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [108, 111] Motions for Extension of Time to File Response to production requests to 10/5/09. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 5, 2009. (Setser, Erin)
October 5, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER withdrawing 109 Motion to Compel pursuant to notice of withdrawal filed on 10/2/09. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 5, 2009. (Setser, Erin)
October 2, 2009 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 2, 2009 110 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 109 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Robert Chiaviello Withdrawing Motion to Compel (Schwarz, Kurt)
October 1, 2009 109 MOTION to Compel Response from Nonparty Robert Chiaviello by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition transcript, John Ward, Jr., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of deposition, Bob Chiviello, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition transcript, Robert Chiaviello)(Schwarz, Kurt) Modified on 10/2/2009 to add text and label exhibit numbers (cap).
September 30, 2009 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
September 21, 2009 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey P. Culbertson on behalf of John Ward, Jr (Culbertson, Geoffrey)
September 18, 2009 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Towle on behalf of John Ward, Jr (Towle, Courtney)
September 18, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Courtney Towle is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if she has not already done so and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 18, 2009. (kcg)
September 16, 2009 105 MOTION for Courtney Towle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
September 16, 2009 104 Featured Case ORDER granting 102 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadline pending a resolution of the issue currently before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. All other deadlines remain the same. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 16, 2009. (cap) Modified on 9/17/2009 to correct text (cap).
September 15, 2009 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadline filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Schwarz, Kurt) Modified on 9/16/2009 to label exhibits (cap).
September 11, 2009 102 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadline by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
September 11, 2009 101 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Request for Production and Brief in Support Thereof by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 100 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of Bob Chiavello (Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 99 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of Raymond P. Niro (Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 98 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of Paul McAndrews (Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 97 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of George McAndrews (Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 96 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of Danny Williams (Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 95 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Deposition of Sam Baxter (Babcock, Charles)
September 2, 2009 94 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Eighth Circuit Motion to Stay (Schwarz, Kurt)
September 2, 2009 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 90 Motion to Stay. Cisco's compliance with the August 24, 2009 Order is hereby stayed pending a ruling from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 2, 2009. (cap)
September 1, 2009 92 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS NOTICE (USCA) of filing petition for writ of mandamus 09-3055, 8th Circuit Court of Appeals (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(cap) Modified on 9/2/2009 to correct date filed in 8USCA (cap).
September 1, 2009 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 89 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Pending Appeal and Brief in Support filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Patton, Nicholas)
August 26, 2009 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 89 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Pending Appeal and Brief in Support by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 26, 2009 TEXT ONLY AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Granting 65 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Final Scheduling Order filed by John Ward, Jr. Jury Trial RESET for 2/8/2010 08:30 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Discovery deadline is extended to 10/1/09; dispositive motions deadline is extended to 10/12/09; motions to amend must be filed by 10/19/09. THIS COURT'S PREVIOUS SCHEDULING ORDER REMAINS IN EFFECT. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 26, 2009. (gg)
August 24, 2009 89 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Compel; granting as to Motion to Compel and Court orders that Cisco shall, within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, produce to Ward in response to the interrogatories at issue all documents, emails and written communications written by or received by Frenkel prior to October 19, 2007; declining, at this time, to take up any request for 61 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 24, 2009. (cap)
August 21, 2009 88 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on July 29, 2009, before Judge Jimm Larry Hendren. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Theresa Sawyer, Telephone number 479-444-7876. Tape Number: 09-66-TS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before or after the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it, or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through PACER. A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 9/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2009. (cap)
August 5, 2009 Court Recording of Phone conference held on 7/29/09, by Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer, Envelope No. 09-66-TS, Location: Fayetteville, AR. (tg)
July 30, 2009 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted SUR-REPLY filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 29, 2009 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2009. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
July 28, 2009 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Schwarz on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Schwarz, Kurt)
July 27, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kurt A. Schwarz is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 27, 2009. (cpg)
July 27, 2009 85 MOTION for Kurt A. Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Griffin, Richard)
July 22, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to 7/30/09. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 22, 2009. (els)
July 20, 2009 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply as to 70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 7/21/2009 to edit text (cap).
July 16, 2009 83 RESPONSE to Motion re 78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Cisco System Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 10, 2009 82 REPLY and Brief to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 7/13/2009 to add language re Brief (msj).
July 9, 2009 81 Featured Case ORDER granting the motion portion of 75 Submission Log and Motion for an Order Directing Cisco to Provide Identified Documents to the Court for In Camera Review, and defendant, Cisco, is again ordered to produce to the Court, for in camera review, any and all documents which could be responsive to plaintiff's interrogatories numbers 5 and 6 and it is ordered that such production shall include, specifically, all documents listed in plaintiff's submission log; and that the in camera production be made within five (5) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 8, 2009. (cap)
July 8, 2009 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION for an Order Directing Cisco to Provide Identified Documents to the Court for In Camera Review filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A-1, # 2 Ex. A-2, # 3 Ex. B, # 4 Ex. C, # 5 Ex. D, # 6 Ex. E, # 7 Ex. F, # 8 Ex. G, # 9 Ex. H, # 10 Ex. I, # 11 Ex. J, # 12 Ex. K, # 13 Ex. L)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 2, 2009 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - SEE DOCUMENT 79 ANSWER/REPLY to 71 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by John Ward, Jr.(cap)
July 2, 2009 79 REPLY by John Ward, Jr re 71 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Patton, Nicholas)
July 1, 2009 78 MOTION to Compel and Brief Responses to Cisco System Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 7/2/2009 to reflect brief (dmc).
June 30, 2009 77 RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION for an Order Directing Cisco to Provide Identified Documents to the Court for In Camera Review filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Tabs 1-4, # 2 Exhibit A, Tabs 5-6, # 3 Exhibit A, Tabs 7-8, # 4 Exhibit A, Tab 9, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Order)(Babcock, Charles)
June 29, 2009 76 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff John Ward, Jr to 75 MOTION for an Order Directing Cisco to Provide Identified Documents to the Court for In Camera Review Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Privilege Log - Ex. 1 to DE #75. (Patton, Nicholas)
June 29, 2009 Document 75 , Motion for Order, Exhibit 1. Hyperlink to Exhibit 1 broken as directed by Judge Hendren's chambers. Redacted version will be filed. (cap)
June 26, 2009 75 MOTION for an Order Directing Cisco to Provide Identified Documents to the Court for In Camera Review by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Pltf's Submission Log, # 2 Ex. A to Submission Log, # 3 Ex. B to Submissio Log, # 4 Ex. C to Submission Log, # 5 Ex. D to Submission Log, # 6 Ex. 2, # 7 Ex. 3, # 8 Ex. 4, # 9 Ex. 5, # 10 Ex. 6)(Patton, Nicholas)
June 26, 2009 74 RESPONSE & BRIEF in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 6/29/2009 to add text (cap).
June 22, 2009 73 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff John Ward, Jr to 66 Amended Complaint. (Patton, Nicholas)
June 19, 2009 72 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 6/12/09, before Judge Jimm Larry Hendren. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Theresa Sawyer, Telephone number 479-444-7876. Envelope Number: 09-50-TS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it,or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through PACER. A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 7/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2009. (jn)
June 17, 2009 Court Recording of Conference Call held on 6/12/09, by Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer, Envelope No. 09-50-TS, Location: Fayetteville, AR. (tg)
June 12, 2009 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2009. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
June 12, 2009 71 ANSWER to 66 First Amended Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against John Ward, Jr by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 6/15/2009 to add link (cap).
June 12, 2009 70 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-1, # 5 Exhibit D-2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
June 12, 2009 69 RESPONSE by John Ward, Jr re 67 Sur-Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 6/15/2009 to add text (cap).
June 12, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply. Plaintiff shall have 3 days from the date of this order in which to file the response. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 12, 2009. (els)
June 10, 2009 68 MOTION for Leave to File Response to New Arguments Raised for the First Time in Cisco's Sur-Rply, or Alternatively to Strike Cisco's Sur-Reply by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Ex. A, # 3 Ex. B, # 4 Ex. C, # 5 Ex. D, # 6 Ex. E, # 7 Ex. F, # 8 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
June 4, 2009 67 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION to Compel (Reply to Response to Motion to Compel - Dkt. 58) MOTION to Compel (Reply to Response to Motion to Compel - Dkt. 58) and Defendant's Motion to Amend or Clarify the March 30, 2009 Order Regarding Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 6/8/2009 to add text (cap).
June 2, 2009 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cisco Systems, Inc., filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Patton, Nicholas)
June 2, 2009 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 62 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The amended pleading should be filed within ten (10) days. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 2, 2009. (cpg)
May 27, 2009 65 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Final Scheduling Order by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
May 21, 2009 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6, # 7 Ex. 7, # 8 Ex. 8, # 9 Ex. 9, # 10 Ex. 10, # 11 Ex. 11, # 12 Ex. 12, # 13 Ex. 13, # 14 Ex. 14, # 15 Ex. 15, # 16 Ex. 16, # 17 Ex. 17, # 18 Ex. 18)(Patton, Nicholas)
May 11, 2009 63 RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Amend or Clarify Its March 30, 2009 Order Regarding Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 11, 2009 62 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - First Amended Complaint, # 2 Ex. A to Complaint, # 3 Ex. B to Complaint, # 4 Ex. C to Complaint)(Patton, Nicholas)
April 27, 2009 61 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J, # 11 Ex. K, # 12 Ex. L, # 13 Ex. M, # 14 Ex. N, # 15 Ex. O)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 30, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1-9 as stated in order, and Cisco is ordered to respond within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 30, 2009. (cap)
March 4, 2009 59 REPLY to 58 Response to 57 Motion to Compel by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 3/5/2009 to edit text and create document link (cap).
February 25, 2009 58 RESPONSE to Motion re 57 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1-9 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1-9 by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 2/25/2009 to edit text (cap).
February 13, 2009 57 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1-9 by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A, # 2 Exh. B, # 3 Exh. C)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 12, 2009 56 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena Served - Google, Inc. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 30, 2009 55 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena - Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 28, 2009 54 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena to be Served Upon Jillian Powell (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2009 to clarify text(cnn).
January 28, 2009 53 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena to be Served Upon Kevin Meeks (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2009 to clarify text (cnn).
January 28, 2009 52 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena to be Served Upon John Noh (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2009 to clarify text (cnn).
January 28, 2009 51 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena to be Served Upon Baker Botts LLP (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2009 to clarify text (cnn).
January 28, 2009 50 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Notice of Subpoena to be Served Upon Richard Frenkel (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2009 to clarify text (cnn).
December 18, 2008 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to Serve 10 Special Interrogatories. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 18, 2008. (cap)
December 12, 2008 48 RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION for Leave to Serve 10 Special Interrogatories filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
December 9, 2008 47 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/31/2009 08:30 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 9, 2008. (gg)
December 9, 2008 46 Featured Case ORDER denying 42 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 9, 2008. (cap)
December 5, 2008 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Protective Order filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 5, 2008 44 NOTICE by John Ward, Jr Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosures (Patton, Nicholas)
December 5, 2008 43 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
December 5, 2008 42 MOTION for Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 3, 2008 41 MOTION for Leave to Serve 10 Special Interrogatories by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 1, 2008 40 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 12/2/2008 to note joint report (cap).
December 1, 2008 39 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 37 Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 1, 2008. (cap)
November 3, 2008 38 RESPONSE to Motion re 37 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support, 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion for Leave,,,,,,,,, 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in SupportSupplemental MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support, 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion for Leave,,,,,,,,, 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
October 29, 2008 37 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support, 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion for Leave,,,,,,,,, 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
October 22, 2008 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 15, 2008 35 MOTION for Reconsideration of 33 Order denying 4 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue and 5 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Volkswagen Opinion)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 10/16/2008 to create document links and label exhibit (cap).
October 1, 2008 34 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2008. Final Scheduling Order issue date 12/11/2008. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2009 08:30 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 1, 2008. (gg)
September 30, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue; granting 24 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding It's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue; granting 27 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding Cisco System's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 30, 2008. (cap)
August 28, 2008 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant Rick Frenkel. Further ordering that plaintiff's complaint against Frenkel be, and it hereby is, dismissed without prejudice, under the terms and conditions set forth in this order; finding as moot 20 Motion for Hearing. Defendant Rick Frenkel terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2008. (cap)
August 14, 2008 31 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Opposition to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel Without Prejudice Subject to His Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Rick Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition)(Barnes, Michael)
August 14, 2008 30 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Patton, Nicholas)
August 6, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Deadline - Motion Hearing cancelled by the court. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 6, 2008. (gg)
July 28, 2008 29 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding Cisco System's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
July 18, 2008 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding It's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Parker, Crystal)
July 16, 2008 27 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding Cisco System's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 10, 2008 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal J. Parker on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Parker, Crystal)
July 9, 2008 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding It's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 8, 2008 24 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record Regarding It's Pending Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
June 4, 2008 23 NOTICE of Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of Rick Frenkel (McWilliams, George)
May 29, 2008 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 20 MOTION for Hearing re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel : Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2008 01:30 PM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. (gg)
May 15, 2008 22 SURREPLY & BRIEF to 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of His Surreply in Opposition to Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 5/16/2008 to edit text (cap).
May 8, 2008 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re MOTION to Transfer Case, 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Babcock, Charles)
May 6, 2008 20 MOTION for Hearing re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel by Rick Frenkel. (Barnes, Michael)
May 2, 2008 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel filed by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
April 29, 2008 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Babcock, IV on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
April 28, 2008 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Rick Frenkel. Answer to Complaint 11 and other pleadings lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. All listed attorneys, other than the attorney signing the pleading (GEORGE L. McWILLIAMS), must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cap)
April 25, 2008 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel filed by Rick Frenkel. (Barnes, Michael)
April 25, 2008 16 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Honorable Harry F. Barnes no longer assigned to the case. (cap)
April 24, 2008 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of G. William Lavender, # 2 Declaration of R. Gary Nutter, # 3 Ex. A, # 4 Ex. B, # 5 Ex. C, # 6 Ex. D, # 7 Ex. E, # 8 Ex. F, # 9 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
April 24, 2008 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Rick Frenkel by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
April 24, 2008 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rick Frenkel. (Barnes, Michael)
April 24, 2008 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rick Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Barnes, Michael)
April 24, 2008 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rick Frenkel.(Barnes, Michael)
April 21, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 4/24/2008. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 4/21/2008. (ljl)
April 21, 2008 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
April 11, 2008 9 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff John Ward, Jr to 1 Complaint. (cap)
April 10, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Crystal J. Parker is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 4/10/2008. (ljl)
April 10, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles L. Babcock is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 4/10/2008. (ljl)
April 8, 2008 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED - See document 4 ...... or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by Cisco Systems, Inc. (cap)
April 8, 2008 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand subject to Cisco's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Griffin, Richard)
April 8, 2008 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Crystal J. Parker by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Griffin, Richard)
April 8, 2008 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles L. Babcock by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Griffin, Richard)
April 8, 2008 5 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue with Appendix of Unpublished Opinions by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Griffin, Richard)
April 8, 2008 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order to Dismiss, # 6 Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer)(Griffin, Richard)
March 19, 2008 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Peden on behalf of John Ward, Jr (Peden, Patricia)
March 19, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Patricia L. Peden is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on 3/19/2008. (ljl)
March 18, 2008 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Patricia L. Peden) by John Ward, Jr. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 13, 2008 Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc., Rick Frenkel and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (cap)
March 13, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc., Rick Frenkel ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4000128.), filed by John Ward, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas H. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Frenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?