Milner v. Carlton et al

Plaintiff: Larry D Milner and Bow Love
Defendant: Bobby Carlton, Mems McKinnon and Does
Case Number: 4:2008cv04039
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 49 Report and Recommendations, denying 36 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Larry D Milner, granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mems McKinnon, Bobby Carlton. Plaintiff's Complaint against the Defendants is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 9, 2009. (cap)
August 17, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 36 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Larry D Milner and 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mems McKinnon, Bobby Carlton; Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 17, 2009. (cnn)
November 26, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 . Bow Love dismissed as plaintiff without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 26, 2008. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milner v. Carlton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D Milner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bow Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mems McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?