Clements v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Holly Angel Clements
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2008cv04078
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees adopting 9 Report and Recommendations granting 7 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $2656.50 under EAJA. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 1, 2009. (cnn) Modified on 12/2/2009 to edit text (lw).
November 9, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Holly Angel Clements. Objections to R&R due by 11/27/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 9, 2009. (lw)
August 28, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 ; decision of Social Security Administration is reversed and remanded pursuant to "sentence four" of 42:405(g). Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 28, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Angel Clements
Represented By: Matthew F. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?