Financial Federal Credit Inc. v. Eudy Forestry Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Financial Federal Credit Inc.
Defendant: Eudy Forestry Services, Inc., Brian S Eudy, Anthony D Eudy and First State Bank of DeQueen, Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2008cv04079
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 11, 2010. (cnn)
October 31, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss counterclaim. Counter-defendant Financial Federal Credit Inc. and counter-claimant First State Bank of DeQueen, Arkansas terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 31, 2008. (cap)
October 23, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DELIVERY directed to United States Marshal directing him to assist Financial Federal Credit, Inc. in obtaining possession of propery set forth in this order, with delivery to be made on or before October 30, 2008. Requirement for Bond for Delivery has been waived. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 23, 2008. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Federal Credit Inc. v. Eudy Forestry Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Federal Credit Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Ramsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eudy Forestry Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S Eudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony D Eudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank of DeQueen, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?