Hawkins v. Wells et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Hawkins
Defendant: Claud Wells and Connie Michelle
Case Number: 4:2008cv04096
Filed: October 15, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 12 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint on the ground that he has failed to comply with the Court's Order directing him to submit a completed IFP application or pay the filing fee in connection with this case. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 2, 2009. (cap)
February 5, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 and 10 MOTION(s) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy Hawkins; plaintiff has failed to provide completed IFP, failed to pay filing fee and failed to respond to court order; case should be dismissed; Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 5, 2009. (cnn)
October 15, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Arkansas and directing the Clerk to immediately transmit a copy of this order and the original file to the Clerk in the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/08. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 10/16/2008.]
October 8, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to amend his complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/8/08. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 10/16/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Wells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claud Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?