Ondirsek et al v. Hoffman

Plaintiff: Spencer Ondirsek and Seth Calagna
Defendant: Bernie Lazar Hoffman and John E. Kolbek
Case Number: 4:2008cv04113
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Sale of Properties Subject to 381 Fifth Writ of Execution. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 6, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
September 2, 2015 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Sale of Properties Subject to 375 Fourth Writ of Execution. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 2, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
July 29, 2015 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving the U.S. Marshal Service of any further responsibilities in connection with voluntarily removed properties re 357 Order. (See Order for specific property.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 29, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
May 13, 2015 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing supplemental briefing re 372 Fourth MOTION for Writ of Execution filed by Spencer Ondirsek, Seth Calagna. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 13, 2015. (mll)
October 6, 2014 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving the U.S. Marshal Service of any futher responsibilities in connection with certain properties re 357 Order. (See Order for specific properties.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 6, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
September 30, 2014 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving the U.S. Marshal Service of any futher responsibilities in connection with voluntarily removed properties re 357 Order. (See Order for specific properties.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 30, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
August 8, 2014 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Sale of Properties Subject to Third Writ of Execution 351 . See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 8, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
July 17, 2014 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 352 Fifth Motion to Invalidate Mechanic's Liens. The four mechanics' liens filed by David Romero, Jon Curry, Zechariah Edwards, and Greg Seago (numbered 2013F-19388 through 2013F-19391) are invalid. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2014. (mll)
April 30, 2014 336 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER finding that 210 Claim filed by Douglas Brubach and 214 Claim filed by William Wattles are not valid. The U.S. Marshal is directed to sell the properties at issue in the Second Writ of Execution to satisfy the Final Judgment in this matter. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 30, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
April 9, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order for Sale of Certain Properties granting 330 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 9, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)
March 12, 2014 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding Douglas Brubach has standing to assert an ownership interest in 210 Redcut Road and William Wattles has standing to assert an ownership interest in 944 Locust, denying remaining Claimants' claims to property ownership. For the rema inder of the properties described in the Second Writ of Execution, the Court directs the U.S. Marshals Office to immediately advertise and sell these properties in accordance with Ark. Code Ann. §§ 16-66-401 to 16-66-507. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 12, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll) Modified on 3/13/2014 to edit text. (mll)
March 6, 2014 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 315 Motion to Enforce; granting 316 Motion to Supplement Motion to Enforce. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal's Office to immediately advertise and sell the properties at 4301 Windsor Drive, Fort Smith, Sebastian County, Arkansas and 4401 Windsor Drive, Fort Smith, Sebastian County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 6, 2014. (mll)
January 21, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying certain aspects of 200 Amended Memorandum Opinion. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 21, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified). (mll)
January 15, 2014 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 142 Second MOTION for Writ of Execution filed by Spencer Ondirsek, Seth Calagna. The Court orders Plaintiffs to provide any and all property records (including records from the applicable county assessor's office) related to the twelve properties in dispute by January 31, 2014. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 15, 2014. (mll)
December 18, 2013 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 231 Motion to Secure the Six Properties Subject to Writ of Execution. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 18, 2013. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
December 12, 2013 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 204 Motion to Compel. Sharon Alamo has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to provide the documents requested in Plaintiffs' subpoena duces tecum. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 12, 2013. (mll)
November 7, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION re 197 Memorandum Opinon entered 10/31/2013. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 7, 2013. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mll)
October 31, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 31, 2013. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mll)
September 13, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 108 Claim filed by Steve Crook, 116 Claim filed by Marty Moan, 122 Claim filed by Jon Curry, 107 Claim filed by Marc Archambault, 123 Claim filed by David McAdams, 114 Claim filed by Rocky Hathaway, 103 Claim file d by Ben Edwards, 117 Claim filed by Anna Moan, 118 Claim filed by Bruce Kost, 113 Claim filed by Dave Romero, 125 Claim filed by Shelley Garner, 124 Claim filed by Jack Garner, 115 Claim filed by Zechariah Edwards, 112 Cl aim filed by Jordan Jones, 102 Claim filed by Donn Wolf, 105 Claim filed by Greg Seago, 109 Claim filed by Jennifer Seago, 111 Claim filed by Frank Fazzalero, 126 Claim filed by Chris Espinosa, 119 Claim filed by Jay Porter, 120 Claim filed by Moses Pech, 106 Claim filed by Anita Willis, 110 Claim filed by Butch Douglas, 128 Claim filed by Al Johnson, 127 Claim filed by Josiah Kolbek, 121 Claim filed by Mike Lowe, 104 Claim filed by Thomas Scarcello. Bench trial set for October 9, 2013. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 13, 2013. (mll)
December 5, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Seth Calagna, Spencer Ondirsek against Bernie Lazar Hoffman in the amount of $30,000,000.00 total, and interest at the rate of 0.19% per annum until paid. $3,000,000.00 in actual damages and $12,000,000.00 in punititive damages for each Plaintiff. Post judgment interest rate of 0.19% from 6/30/11 until judgment is paid. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 5, 2012. (cap)
June 30, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Seth Calagna in the amount of $33,000,000.00, in favor of Spencer Ondirsek in the amount of $33,000,000.00, and against Bernie Lazar Hoffman in the total amount of $66,000,000.00 and interest at the rate of 0.19% per annum from the date this judgment is entered until paid. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 30, 2011. (cap)
September 30, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss or Strike References to Religion and to Dismiss Count Three on Tort of Outrage. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 30, 2009. (cap)
September 14, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Sever all claims against separate Defendant John E. Kolbek, and directing the Clerk to assign a new case number to the severed action. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 14, 2009. (cap) Modified on 9/14/2009 to edit text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ondirsek et al v. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Ondirsek
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Calagna
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Lazar Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Kolbek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?