McKamie v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Sharon Elizabeth McKamie
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2008cv04122
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 19 Report and Recommendations, granting 14 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Sharon Elizabeth McKamie in the amount of $3,887.80 to be paid out of plaintiff's past due benefits. However, the $3,887.80 fee under Section 406(b) is offset by the $2,784.00 previously awarded under the EAJA, and Plaintiff's attorney is directed to remit to plaintiff the smaller fee awarded to plaintiff's attorney pursuant to the EAJA in the amount of $2,784.00. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 6, 2011. (cap)
September 1, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 12 Report and Recommendations, awarding Plaintiff's counsel attorney fees in the amount of $2,784.00 under EAJA. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 1, 2010. (cap)
February 5, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE TO Commissioner of Social Security for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C.§ 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 4, 2010. (Copy of Report and Recommendations and Judgment furnished to OHA)(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKamie v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Elizabeth McKamie
Represented By: John G. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?